MA H1328 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop housing strategies to end the homelessness of unaccompanied adults. Housing.
Title
To transform the Commonwealth’s emergency response system and create housing strategies to end the homelessness of unaccompanied adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S873 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1328.pdf |