MA H1349 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to attorney services or management consultants for services performed for collective bargaining or issues arising from collective bargaining contracts. Public Service.
Title
Relative to collective bargaining
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1438 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1349 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1349.pdf |