MA H1356 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the unlawful passing of a school bus. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the unlawful passing of a school bus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2113 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2102 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2984 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3016 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2102 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2984 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3016 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1356 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1356.pdf |