MA H1365 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a tuition free program for teachers and paraprofessionals. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to establishing a tuition free program for teachers and paraprofessionals
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5174 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H1362 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1733 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2771
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1362 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1733 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2771
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1365 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1365.pdf |