MA H1370 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1370 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1370.pdf |