MA H1394 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of consistent with local needs under the affordable housing law. Housing.
Title
Relative to the definition of consistent with local needs in chapter 40b
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H2986 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S884 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2935 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3157
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H2986 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S884 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2935 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3157
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1394 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1394.pdf |