MA H1417 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Paul Scott Noe, an employee of the Trial Court, to transfer his vacation benefits accrued during his time in the Norfolk County Sheriff’s Department. The Judiciary.
Title
Allowing a benefits transfer for Paul Scott Noe, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-11 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1417.pdf |