MA H1431 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain habitual offenders. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to certain habitual offenders
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H256 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1782 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H1266 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4044 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1782 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H1266 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4044 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1431.pdf |