MA H1446 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fair housing assessments for large-scale housing developments. Housing.
Title
Establishing a statewide affirmatively furthering fair housing framework
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S204 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
S861 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5264
H1441 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5264
H1854 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S861 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5264
H1441 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5264
H1854 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1446.pdf |