MA H1450 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modify the rules for taking depositions outside the Commonwealth and to adopt the uniform interstate depositions and discovery act. The Judiciary.
Title
To modify the rules for taking depositions outside the Commonwealth and to adopt the uniform interstate depositions and discovery act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4327 |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4327 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1450.pdf |