MA H1460 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating an alternative process for the disposition of vacant real property owned by municipalities. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the disposal of municipally owned vacant property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4447 |
2011-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4447 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1460 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11961&generalCourtId=1 |