MA H149 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require businesses offering travel services to provide consumers with health and safety information relative to international destinations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts travelers bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S504 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
H104 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
H1955 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
S46 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S129 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - New draft substituted, see S2380
H104 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
H1955 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4492
S46 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H149.pdf |