MA H1518 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S939
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant police powers to court officers and those authorized to act as court officers when attending court proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the safety of courthouses and remote court proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-05 | House | Accompanied by S939 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S939 (Replaces) 2015-10-05 - Accompanied H1518
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1518.pdf |