MA H1577 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the protection of firefighters and emergency medical technicians from civil liability for rendering emergency cardiopulmonary resuscitation. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the protection of firefighters and emergency medical technicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S1993 |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-11-20 | House | Passed to be engrossed 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 271) |
2013-11-20 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted, consolidating with S829 |
2013-11-20 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2013-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1577 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1577.pdf |