MA H16 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1538
Note: Replaces legislation H2200
Note: Replaces legislation H2200
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Massachusetts Teachers' Retirement System (House, No. 15) as relates to said system. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-06 | House | Accompanied by S1538 and H2200 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H17 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H21
H63 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H50 (Similar To) 2019-12-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H62 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S335 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H10 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
H11 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H28 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H29 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H30 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5054
H31 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1538 (Replaces) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
H2200 (Replaces) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
H63 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H50 (Similar To) 2019-12-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H62 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S335 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H10 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H13 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - House concurred
H11 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H28 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H29 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H30 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5054
H31 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1538 (Replaces) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
H2200 (Replaces) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H16 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H16.pdf |