MA H160 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4027
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the education of children who are deaf or hard of hearing. Education.
Title
Establishing a bill of rights for children who are deaf or hard of hearing
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Carlo Basile [D] | Rep. George Ross [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. David Sullivan [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4027 |
2011-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4027 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H160 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8529&generalCourtId=1 |