MA H1601 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that certain construction industry employers provide occupational safety and health administration training to employees. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring OSHA training
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1601.pdf |