MA H1646 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve after hours bail procedures. The Judiciary.
Title
To improve after hours bail procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S993 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H1494 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H4598 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S993 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H1494 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H4598 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1646.pdf |