MA H1694 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for removing walls and fences without prior consent of the owner
Title
Penalties for removing walls and fences without prior consent of the owner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-06-09 | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-04-26 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2010-04-05 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 7/14 at 12:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h01694.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht01/ht01694.htm |