MA H1694 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1765
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to strengthening the civil penalties of stop work orders under the workers’ compensation statute. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to strengthening the civil penalties of stop work orders under the workers' compensation statute
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-06-11 | House | Accompanied by H1765 |
2015-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1765 (Replaces) 2015-06-11 - Accompanied H1694
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1694 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1694.pdf |