MA H1704 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4450
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a behavioral health workforce development trust fund. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Establishing a behavioral health workforce development trust fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4450 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H569 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H569 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1704.pdf |