MA H1724 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2671
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. LeBoeuf of Worcester, a petition of David Henry Argosky LeBoeuf, David Allen Robertson and Elizabeth A. Malia establishing a right to counsel in civil asset forfeiture cases. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a right to counsel in civil asset forfeiture cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2671 |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1735 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S915 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1745 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3171 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1678 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S911 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2671 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
S915 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1745 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3171 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1678 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S911 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2671 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1724 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1724.pdf |