MA H1726 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2596
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further clear titles to real property affected by technical irregularities in recorded instruments. The Judiciary.
Title
To further clear titles to real property affected by technical irregularities in recorded instruments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2596 |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2596
S1074 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2596
S2596 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1074 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2596
S2596 (Replaced by) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1726 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1726.pdf |