MA H1733 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-13)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1866 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1733.pdf |