MA H1756 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to abandoned beverage container recycling grants for municipalities and state parks. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to recycling grants for municipalities and state parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2017-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3394 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1744 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1772 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3528 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H810 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1744 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1772 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3528 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H810 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1756.pdf |