MA H1765 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide unemployment benefits to certain employees of public educational institutions. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To provide unemployment benefits to laid off employees of educational institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4446 |
2014-04-22 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday May 01, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2013 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4446 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1765 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1765.pdf |