MA H1788 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish in the Executive Office of Housing and Economic Development a housing development pilot program to offer incentives to cities and towns to zone for substantial multifamily housing and/or mixed use development in transit-oriented locations. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Creating a multi-family housing incentive pilot program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H1327 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1323 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
H3979 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4368
H1327 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S817 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1788 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1788.pdf |