MA H1808 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle speed limits within urban districts. Transportation.
Title
Relative to speed limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4165 |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4165 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1808 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12471&generalCourtId=1 |