MA H4165 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1808
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to speed limits (House, No. 4165).
Title
Relative to speed limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-14 | House | New draft of H1808 |
2012-06-14 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1808 (Replaces) 2012-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4165
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4165 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118829&generalCourtId=1 |