MA H1820 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to courtesy retail parking spaces designed for non-handicapped veterans. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to courtesy retail parking spaces designed for non-handicapped veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1820 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1820.pdf |