MA H1840 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis of Winchester and Senator Ms. Jehlen, a joint petition of Patricia Jehlen and Jason M. Lewis that the town of Winchester be authorized to issue temporary loans. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Governing the issuance of temporary loans by the town of Winchester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-06-09 | House | Enacted |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-05-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-03-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-03-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-03-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-03-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1840 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7926&generalCourtId=1 |