MA H1840 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2672
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to impose penalties for cruel conditions for animals. The Judiciary.
Title
Enhancing the issuance of citations for cruel conditions for animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2672 |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1097 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S2672 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2672 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1840 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1840.pdf |