MA H1844 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include psychologists in the definition of nursing practice. Public Health.
Title
Relative to facilitating the utilization of psychologists on the health care team
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1225 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1878 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
H1878 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1844.pdf |