MA H1846 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motorcycle rider education curriculum. Transportation.
Title
Relative to updating Massachusetts driver education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2017-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/17 from 3:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1917 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1887 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1922 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1862 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1917 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1887 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1922 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1862 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1846 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1846.pdf |