MA H1869 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish medical civil rights. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing medical civil rights
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Santiago [D] | Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] |
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S802 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S802 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1869 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1869.pdf |