MA S1603 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2766
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care facilities to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring health care facilities to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2766 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2506 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2766 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
S1605 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2766 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1603 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1603.pdf |