MA H1872 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to health insurance benefits for elected officials in the town of Harwich. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to health insurance for elected officials in the town of Harwich
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-09-16 | House | Enacted |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-08-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-08-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-08-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1872 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1872.pdf |