MA H1884 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4472
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include psychologists in the definition of nursing practice. Public Health.
Title
Relative to facilitating the utilization of psychologists on the health care team
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4472 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4472 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4686
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1884 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1884.pdf |