MA H189 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4467
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assure that polling places are accessible to handicapped and elderly voters. Election Laws.
Title
Assuring that polling places are accessible to elderly and physically challenged voters.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4467 |
2011-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4467 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H189 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8417&generalCourtId=1 |