MA H1931 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4591
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state and local services provided to veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To provide for a special commission to study veteran’s benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4591 |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S949 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
H4540 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - H4525, published as amended
H4591 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S949 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
H4540 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - H4525, published as amended
H4591 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1931 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1931.pdf |