MA H1935 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - New draft substituted, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - New draft substituted, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to strengthening the local and regional public health systems by establishing a state action for public health excellence program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to strengthening the local and regional public health system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | New draft substituted, see H4503 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4503 |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1294 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1694 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4503 (Replaced by) 2020-04-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2020
S1694 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4503 (Replaced by) 2020-04-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1935 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1935.pdf |