MA H1979 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Board of Registration in Nursing. Public Health.
Title
Relative to equitable board representation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1278 (Similar To) 2020-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2751
S1225 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S681 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S716 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
S1225 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S681 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S716 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1979 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1979.pdf |