MA H1983 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to membership fees at health clubs for certain physically or medically disabled persons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to fees at health clubs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1782 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S76 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1983.pdf |