MA H1993 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the qualifications, service and salaries of county managers
Title
The qualifications, service and salaries of county managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted | |
2010-07-29 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-29 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-28 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-28 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-07 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-06 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-12-17 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-12-17 | Rules suspended | |
2009-12-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2009-11-23 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 10/27 at 10:30 AM in Hearing Room B2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h01993.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht01/ht01993.htm |