MA H1997 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensure of equine dentists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to licensure of equine dentists
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1162 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S156 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2472
S174 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4861
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1162 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S156 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2472
S174 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4861
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1997 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1997.pdf |