MA H2046 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4392
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow school districts to collect a fee associated with nonresident pupil transportation. Education.
Title
To allow for school districts to collect a fee associated with nonresident pupil transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4392 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1847 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H316 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4392 (Replaced by) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H251 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H249 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1847 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H316 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4392 (Replaced by) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2046 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2046.pdf |