MA H205 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3949
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate debt collection licensure. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to debt collection licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3949 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H309 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H203 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H304 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Accompanied S105
H3053 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S162 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3949 (Replaced by) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H309 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H203 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H304 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Accompanied S105
H3053 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1179 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S162 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3949 (Replaced by) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H205 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H205.pdf |