MA H3949 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H205
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to debt collection licensure
Title
Relative to debt collection licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-01 | House | New draft of H205 |
2019-07-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H205 (Replaces) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3949
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S167 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S105 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3949 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3949.pdf |