MA H2075 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4147
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of latex gloves or utensils by food handlers. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the use of all latex gloves and products by persons who handle food
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4147 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4147 (Replaced by) 2014-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2075 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2075.pdf |