MA H2079 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4573
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit cities or towns from failing to enforce federal immigration laws by designating themselves as sanctuary cities and to withhold unrestricted general government aid to cities and towns for non-compliance. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to sanctuary cities and towns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4573 |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S997 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4573 (Replaced by) 2024-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4573 (Replaced by) 2024-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2079 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2079.pdf |